MS SB3100 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Marshall County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The Bishop Houck New Hope Village; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Marshall County; authorize board of supervisors to contribute to Bishop Houck New Hope Village.
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Whaley [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |