MS SB3072 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 1019, Local And Private Laws Of 1996, As Last Amended By Chapter 927, Local And Private Laws Of 2017, To Provide That The Revenue From The Hancock County, Mississippi, Hotel And Motel Tax May Be Used By The Hancock County Tourism Bureau Or The Mississippi Gulf Coast Regional Convention And Visitors Bureau In The Discretion Of The Board Of Supervisors Of Hancock County; To Provide That The Board Of Supervisors Shall Have The Sole Right To Designate That The Proceeds From The Hancock County Hotel And Motel Tax Are Expended By The Hancock County Tourism Bureau Or The Mississippi Gulf Coast Regional Convention And Visitors Bureau; To Provide For An Indirect Referendum On The Question Of Whether The Board Of Supervisors Shall Have The Sole Right To Designate That The Proceeds Of The Tax Are Expended By The Hancock County Tourism Bureau Or The Mississippi Gulf Coast Regional Convention And Visitors Bureau; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hancock County; provide manner in which revenue from a hotel/motel tax may be expended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2018-03-23 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-23 | House | Amended |
2018-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |