MS SB3069 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Hattiesburg, Mississippi, To Levy An Additional Tax On Hotels, Motels And Restaurants; To Provide That The Proceeds Of The Tax Shall Be Used By The City To Promote Tourism And Parks And Recreation; To Authorize The City To Distribute A Portion Of The Tax To The University Of Southern Mississippi To Be Used By The University For Improvements To Its Athletic Facilities; To Authorize The City To Receive And Expend Revenues From Any Source For The Purposes Authorized In This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Hattiesburg; authorize additional tax on hotels, motels and restaurants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 15 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-25 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-24 | House | Passed |
2018-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-23 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-03-14 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: LP To FI |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |