MS SB3064 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From The "mississippi Association Of Independent Colleges And Universities (maicu) Grant Program Fund" To The Department Of Finance And Administration For The Purpose Of Administering The "mississippi Association Of Independent Colleges And Universities (maicu) Infrastructure Grant Program Act Of 2022"; To Make An Appropriation From The Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Fund To The Department Of Finance And Administration For The Purpose Of Administering The "independent Schools Infrastructure Grant Program"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; to DFA for the MAICU and Ind K-12 Grant Program, - ARPA funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Sen. Rita Potts Parks [R] | Sen. Bart Williams [R] |
Sen. David Blount [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 90 N: 13 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Failed (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Failed (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-05 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Conference Report Failed |
2022-04-05 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-05 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-04-05 | House | Reconsidered |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,White |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,Parks |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-16 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-15 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-15 | House | Amended |
2022-03-10 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |