MS SB3059 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Greenville, Mississippi, To Take Any And All Actions Necessary To Enforce The City's Sewer Ordinances As They Affect Customers Who Reside Outside The City's Corporate Limits Who Are Served By The Sanitary Sewer System Of The City; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Greenville; authorize enforcement of sewer ordinances in areas served outside the city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-25 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-24 | House | Passed |
2018-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |