MS SB3059 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 1019, Local And Private Laws Of 1996, As Last Amended By Chapter 924, Local And Private Laws Of 2014, To Extend The Repeal Date On The Provisions Of Law That Create The Hancock County Tourism Development Bureau And Prescribe Its Powers And Duties And Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Hancock County, Mississippi, To Enter Into Contracts With Not-for-profit Organizations For Certain Purposes And Authorize The Levy Of A Tax On The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Derived From Room Rentals By Hotels And Motels; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hancock County; extend the date of repeal on the Hancock County Tourism Development Bureau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed |
2017-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |