MS SB3055 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation To Defray The Expenses Of The State Treasurer's Office For Fiscal Year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Treasurer's Office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18 Approved by Governor
2019-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-26HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-26SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-22HouseConferees Named Read,Snowden,Turner
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Clarke,Burton,Jackson (15th)
2019-03-20SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Appropriations
2019-02-25SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-21SenatePassed
2019-02-19SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-18SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback