MS SB3055 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To Defray The Expenses Of The Department Of Mental Health And Certain Programs Of The Division Of Alcohol And Drug Abuse, For Fiscal Year 2012.
Title
Appropriation; Mental Health, Department of.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Adams Collins [R] | Sen. Videt Carmichael [R] | Sen. Doug Davis [R] | Sen. Billy Hudson [R] |
Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [D] | Sen. T.O. Moffatt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-06 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-31 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 145 | |
2011-03-18 | Conferees Named Davis,Hyde-Smith,Collins | |
2011-03-17 | Conferees Named Stringer,Warren,Dedeaux | |
2011-03-15 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-02-25 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-02-24 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-21 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2011-02-18 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-17 | Passed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-15 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Appropriations |