MS SB3050 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact The "mississippi Public Health And Welfare Emergency Relief Act"; To State Legislative Findings And Intent; To Define Terms; To Require The State Department Of Health To Promulgate Regulations And Develop Procedures To Govern The Administration Of The Programs Created By This Act; To Require The State Department Of Health To Make An Initial Disbursement To Eligible Applicants By August 15, 2020, Subject To Appropriation By The Legislature; To Authorize The State Department Of Health To Request Personnel Or Systems Support Of Any Political Subdivision Of The State; To Require Any Political Subdivision Of The State To Comply With A Request From The State Department Of Health; To Allow The State Department Of Health To Retain A Certain Percentage Of The Funds Available Under This Act; To Describe The Qualifications For Eligibility Under The Programs Established Under This Act; To Require An Applicant To Provide A Certified Application To The State Department Of Health And The Original Itemized Receipt And/or Invoice Of Purchases And Services Paid In Order To Receive Reimbursement; To Provide That No Applicant Shall Receive Reimbursement For Expenditures That Have Been Reimbursed From Another Source Of Funds; To Establish The Hospital Cares Act Program To Reimburse Hospitals For Eligible Expenditures; To Establish The Independent Physician Cares Act Program To Reimburse Independent Physicians For Eligible Expenditures; To Establish The Independent Dentist Cares Act Program To Reimburse Independent Dentists For Eligible Expenditures; To Mandate That The State Department Of Health Shall Not Exceed A Set Sum In Reimbursement For Each Independent Physician Or Dentist; To Establish The Ambulance Cares Act Program To Reimburse Ambulance Providers For Eligible Expenditures; To Mandate That The State Department Of Health Shall Not Exceed A Set Sum Per Registered Ambulance In Reimbursement To An Ambulance Provider; To Establish The Food Pantry Cares Act Program To Reimburse Food Pantries For Eligible Expenditures; To Allow The State Department Of Health To Reimburse Entities Acting On Behalf Of The Food Pantry Or Providing A Service To A Food Pantry; To Establish The Nonprofit Cares Act Program To Reimburse Nonprofits For Eligible Expenditures; To Require The State Department Of Health To Distribute To The Community Foundations A Pro Rata Share Of The Funds Under This Program Based On The Population Served By The Foundation; To Require The Community Foundations To Disburse The Funds As Grants For Nonprofits Which Have Incurred Eligible Expenditures; To Mandate That The Grants To Nonprofits Shall Not Exceed A Certain Sum; To Establish The Multiagency Procurement Of Covid-19-related Materials Cares Act Program To Procure A Statewide Stockpile Of Covid-19-related Materials; To Require The Mississippi Emergency Management Agency, The Mississippi Development Authority And The State Department Of Health To Cooperate To Encourage Manufacturers Of Covid-19-related Materials In Mississippi To Provide Long-term Access For Mississippi; To Require The Mississippi Emergency Management Agency To Purchase Covid-19-related Materials; To Establish The Nursing Homes Cares Act Program To Reimburse Nursing Homes For Eligible Expenditures; To Establish The Medical Provider Cares Act Program To Reimburse The Medical Providers Who Are Not Provided For In A Separate Program In This Act For Eligible Expenditures; To Establish The Child Care Facilities Cares Act Program To Reimburse Child Care Facilities For Eligible Expenditures; To Establish The Community Mental Health Centers Cares Act Program To Reimburse Community Mental Health Centers For Eligible Expenditures; To Establish The Mississippi Home Corporation Cares Act Program To Provide Rental Assistance To Persons Affected By Covid-19; To Create A Special Fund In The State Treasury To Be Known As The "public Health And Welfare Emergency Relief Fund"; To Require The Department To Report To The Legislature And The Governor On The Utilization Of The Programs Created By This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Public Health and Welfare Emergency Relief Act; enact.
Sponsors
Sen. Hob Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-06-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2020-06-24 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69 |