MS SB3048 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-31-55, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That, If A Licensed Free Port Warehouse Failed To Submit The Inventory Required To Be Filed With The Tax Assessor By The March 31, 2020, Deadline, Due To A Required Or Voluntary Closure Of The Business, A Furlough, Layoff Or Other Reduction In Staff Operations, Or The Closure Of County Government Offices Related To Coronavirus Disease 2019 (covid-19), Such Free Port Warehouse May Submit The Required Inventory By July 1, 2020; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Ad valorem taxes; extend deadline for free port warehouses to submit required inventory to tax assessor due to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-26 | House | Passed |
2020-06-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2020-06-22 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69 |