MS SB3045 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Azalean Jones Rogers Of Bolivar County, Mississippi.
Title
Suffrage; Azalean Jones Rogers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-30 | House | Passed |
2020-06-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |