MS SB3035 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Due From Governor 05/21/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Due From Governor 05/21/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 912, Local And Private Laws Of 1999, As Amended By Chapter 929, Local And Private Laws Of 2009, To Extend The Repeal Date On The Provision Authorizing The Board Of Supervisors Of Stone County To Levy An Assessment On Misdemeanor Convictions To Fund The "w.d. 'dub' Rustin Memorial Building"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Stone County; extend repeal date on provision authorizing certain assessment on misdemeanor convictions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Due From Governor 05/21/12 | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-05-01 | Immediate Release | |
2012-05-01 | Passed | |
2012-04-30 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-04-29 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | |
2012-04-28 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-28 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-28 | Passed | |
2012-04-28 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-04-27 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-04-25 | Referred To Local and Private |