MS SB3033 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Site Development Grant Program To Be Administered By The Mississippi Development Authority For The Purpose Of Providing Grants To Municipalities, Counties And Local Economic Development Organizations To Assist In Paying Costs Associated With Improving The Marketability Of Publicly Owned Industrial Property For Industrial Economic Development Purposes; To Create The Mississippi Site Development Grant Fund To Be Administered By The Mississippi Development Authority; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $2,000,000.00 To Provide Funds For The Site Development Grant Fund; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For Capital Improvements At The State-owned Shipyard Located In Jackson County, Mississippi; To Provide That The Issuance Of Such Bonds Shall Be Conditioned On The Lessee Incurring A Certain Amount Of Debt And/or Dedicating A Certain Amount Of Funds For Capital Improvements, Capital Investments Or Capital Upgrades To Shipyards In Mississippi Owned Or Leased By Such Lessee; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $10,000,000.00 For The Ace Fund; To Amend Section 57-61-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase By $7,000,000.00 The Amount Of General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act; To Amend Section 57-61-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Amount Of Bond Proceeds That The Mississippi Development Authority May Utilize Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act To Make Grants Or Loans To Counties And Municipalities Through An Equipment And Public Facilities Grant And Loan Fund To Aid In Infrastructure-related Improvements, The Purchase Of Equipment And In The Purchase, Construction Or Repair And Renovation Of Facilities; To Amend Section 57-75-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase From $67,000,000.00 To $68,000,000.00 The Amount Of General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued Under The Mississippi Major Economic Impact Act For Projects Designed To Enhance Facilities That Are At Risk For Closure Pursuant To The Base Closure And Realignment Act Of 1991 Or Other Applicable Federal Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; create Mississippi Site Development Grant program and authorize bonds for it and various MDA programs and state shipyard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed |
2017-03-08 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Finance |