MS SB3032 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Due From Governor 05/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Due From Governor 05/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Gautier, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants And Upon The Gross Sales Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals; To Provide That The Revenue From The Tax Shall Be Expended By The City Of Gautier For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To Improve Parks And Recreation Facilities For The Purpose Of Tourism And Economic Development Within The City; To Provide That The Tax Shall Be Collected By The Department Of Revenue And Paid To The City Of Gautier; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Gautier; authorize to impose a tax on restaurants, hotels and motels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Due From Governor 05/18/12 | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-28 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-28 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-28 | Passed | |
2012-04-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-04-27 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | |
2012-04-27 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-27 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-27 | Passed | |
2012-04-27 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-04-26 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-04-25 | DR - TSDPCS: LP To FI | |
2012-04-20 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |