MS SB3031 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From Special Funds In The State Treasury To Defray The Expenses Of The Mississippi State Board Of Public Contractors For Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Contractors, Board of.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Rod Hickman [D] |
Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Jeff Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-05-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 64 | |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Read,Rushing |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Norwood,Hill |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | House | Amended |
2024-04-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-09 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To A3 |
2024-04-09 | House | DR - TSDPAA: A3 To AP |
2024-03-20 | House | Referred To Appropriations D;Appropriations A |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |