MS SB3013 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The Town Of North Carrollton, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To Promote Tourism And Parks And Recreation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Town of North Carrollton; authorize a tax on restaurant to provide funds for various purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 12 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 12 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-26 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-26 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-26 | House | Amended |
2018-03-26 | House | Reconsidered |
2018-03-26 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Mettetal, Barton, Jackson) |
2018-03-25 | House | Passed |
2018-03-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-25 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-02-14 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: LP To FI |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |