MS SB3012 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Recommitted For Further Conf
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making Appropriations From The Budget Contingency Fund To The Department Of Finance And Administration To Defray Eligible Covid-19 Expenses For Municipalities And Counties For Fiscal Years 2020 And 2021; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Dept. of Finance and Administration for COVID-19 expenses incurred by municipalities and counties for FY 20 and FY 21.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateRecommitted For Further Conf
2020-06-30HouseRecommitted For Further Conf
2020-06-29HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-23HouseConferees Named Read,White,Barton
2020-06-18SenateConferees Named Hopson,Wiggins,Polk
2020-06-17SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-16HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-15HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-15HouseAmended
2020-06-15HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-12HouseReferred To Appropriations
2020-06-04SenateTransmitted To House
2020-06-03SenatePassed
2020-06-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-06-02SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback