MS SB3005 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Department Of Information Technology Services For Fiscal Year 2013.
Title
Appropriation; Information Technology Services, Department of.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Brown [R] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Videt Carmichael [R] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] |
Sen. Alice Harden [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-29 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-29 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Frierson,DeLano,Barker | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Clarke,Carmichael,Brown | |
2012-04-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-13 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-12 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-12 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-12 | Amended | |
2012-04-11 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-29 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-26 | Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-22 | Referred To Appropriations |