MS SB2997 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 824, Local And Private Laws Of 1992, As Last Amended By Chapter 942, Local And Private Laws Of 2016, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2023, To July 1, 2026, On The Provisions Of Law That Levy The Tourism And Industry Promotion Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Derived From Hotel And Motel Room Rentals And Restaurant Sales In The City And Create The City Of Batesville, Mississippi, And South Panola Area Chamber Of Commerce Tourism And Industrial Development Committee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Batesville; extend repealer on restaurant, hotel and motel tax for tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Recommitted to Committee |
2022-03-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |