MS SB2997 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To James Maurice Mallett Of Hinds County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suffrage; restore to James Maurice Mallett of Hinds County, Mississippi.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18 Approved by Governor
2019-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-28HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-28HousePassed
2019-03-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-03-27HouseReferred To Judiciary B
2019-03-27SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-27SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-27SenatePassed
2019-03-21SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-13SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback