MS SB2994 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Chapter 991, Local And Private Laws Of 1998, As Amended By Chapter 915, Local And Private Laws Of 2013, To Authorize The Walnut Grove Correctional Authority To Provide Housing For Offenders Classified To Any Custody Level; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Walnut Grove; authorize correctional facility to house prisoners who have been classified to any custody level.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 72 N: 36 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29 Approved by Governor
2019-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-26SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-22HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-22HousePassed
2019-03-21HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-03-20HouseReferred To Local and Private Legislation
2019-03-20SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-19SenatePassed
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-03-13SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-02-13SenateReferred To Local and Private

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback