MS SB2989 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-7-455, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize And Empower The County Board Of Education Of Certain Counties To Convey School Buildings Not Used For School Purposes To A Nonprofit Entity That Has Made Substantial Improvements To The Property Without The Necessity Of Advertising For Competitive Bids; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Certain school boards convey school buildings not used for school purposes to nonprofit entity; authorize.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-27 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-19 | Conferees Named Brown,Dickson,Evans (91st) | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Carmichael,Tollison,Harden | |
2010-03-17 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-08 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-08 | Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Education | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-02-03 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Education |