MS SB2984 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 904, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, As Last Amended By Chapter 908, Local And Private Laws Of 2021, To Extend The Repealer From July 1, 2025, To July 1, 2028, On The Provision Of Law Authorizing The Board Of Supervisors Of Jackson County, Mississippi, And The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Pascagoula, Mississippi, To Join Together To Create The Lapointe-krebs Foundation, Inc., For The Preservation, Maintenance, Upkeep And Operation Of The Lapointe-krebs House; To Increase The Amount The Jackson County Board Of Supervisors May Contribute Annually To The Lapointe-krebs Foundation, Inc., From $50,000.00 To $75,000.00; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Jackson County & City of Pascagoula; extend repealer on LaPointe-Krebs Foundation, & authorize increased contribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-18 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-17 | House | Passed |
2024-04-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |