MS SB2981 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From Special Funds In The State Treasury To Defray The Expenses Of The Mississippi State Board Of Public Contractors For Fiscal Year 2019.
Title
Appropriation; Contractors, Board of.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. J.P. Wilemon [D] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] |
Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] | Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |