MS SB2978 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Support And Maintenance Of The Office Of State Aid Road Construction Of The Mississippi Department Of Transportation For Fiscal Year 2018.
Title
Appropriation; Transportation, Department of - State Aid Road Construction, Office of.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2017-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2017-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Read,Busby,Arnold |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Simmons (13th),DeBar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-13 | House | Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |