MS SB2975 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-53-151, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Membership Of The Electronic Government Oversight Committee; To Amend Section 25-53-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Each Member Of The Information Technology Services Board May Continue To Serve For A Certain Period Of Time After The Expiration Of His Term If His Successor Is Not Duly Appointed; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Electronic Government Oversight Committee; revise membership/ITS Board members may serve after expiration of term.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-30 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-22 | Conferees Named Stringer,Brown,Flaggs | |
2011-03-16 | Conferees Named Brown,Chassaniol,Collins | |
2011-03-09 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-07 | Passed | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Fees, Salaries and Administration |