MS SB2974 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 942, Local And Private Laws Of 2014, As Amended By Chapter 941, Local And Private Laws Of 2017, To Extend The Repeal Date On The Provision Of Law Authorizing The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Byram, Mississippi, To Impose A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Room Rentals For Hotels Or Motels Within The City; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Byram; extend repeal date on hotel and motel tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed |
2021-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |