MS SB2972 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation Of Special Funds To Defray The Expenses Of The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security For Fiscal Year 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Employment Security, Department of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13 Approved by Governor
2017-03-30HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-30SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-26SenateConference Report Adopted
2017-03-26HouseConference Report Adopted
2017-03-24SenateConference Report Filed
2017-03-24HouseConference Report Filed
2017-03-23HouseConferees Named Read,Huddleston (15th),Cockerham
2017-03-23SenateConferees Named Clarke,Horhn,Hill
2017-03-15SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2017-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2017-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2017-03-13HouseAmended
2017-03-07HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2017-02-20HouseReferred To Appropriations
2017-02-16SenateTransmitted To House
2017-02-15SenatePassed
2017-02-14SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2017-02-13SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback