MS SB2964 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Hernando, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants And Upon The Gross Sales Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To Promote Tourism And Parks And Recreation Within The City; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Hernando; authorize the imposition of a tax on restaurants, hotels, and motels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 14 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-13 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed |
2014-03-12 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: LP To FI |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |