MS SB2964 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-28 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-28 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Incurred In The Maintenance And Operation Of The Forest And Wildlife Research Center For Fiscal Year 2013.
Title
Appropriation; IHL - Mississippi State University - Forest and Wildlife Research Center.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Gary Jackson [R] |
Sen. Perry Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Frierson,Sullivan,Bell | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Lee | |
2012-04-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-13 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-12 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-12 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-12 | Amended | |
2012-04-11 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-29 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-26 | Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-22 | Referred To Appropriations |