MS SB2961 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Claiborne County, Mississippi, To Lease A Certain Surplus County-owned Building To Theatre Plus, A Nonprofit Entity, For Less Than The Fair Rental Value Of The Building; To Provide For The Amount That Shall Be Charged For The Lease Of The Building; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Claiborne County; authorize rent of a certain surplus building to Theatre Plus for less than the fair rental value of the building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-21 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed |
2016-04-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-16 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |