MS SB2960 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Commission On Judicial Performance Of The State Of Mississippi For The Fiscal Year 2019.
Title
Appropriation; Judicial Performance Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Gary Jackson [R] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-25 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-24 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Read,Snowden,Cockerham |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Jackson (15th),Turner-Ford |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-12 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-08 | House | Amended |
2018-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |