MS SB2950 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-21-323, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand The Duties Of The Juvenile Detention Facilities Monitoring Unit And To Provide That All Monitors Of The Unit Shall Be Employees Of The Department Of Public Safety; To Require The Unit To Investigate And Inspect Group Homes, Which Are In Addition To The Detention Facilities And The Training School That The Unit Currently Inspects; To Provide Certain Duties Of The Unit, Which Include Submitting Quarterly Reports To Certain Elected Officials; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Juvenile Detention Facilities Monitoring Unit; revise certain duties of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-27 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-23 | Conferees Named Banks,Hines,Whittington | |
2010-03-22 | Conferees Named Bryan,Turner,Simmons | |
2010-03-16 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-08 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Juvenile Justice | |
2010-02-15 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-27 | DR - TSDPCS: PH To CR | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Corrections |