MS SB2945 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-32-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Authority Of A County Public Defender Over The Employees Of The County Public Defender's Office Regardless Of The Source Of Funding For The Office; To Repeal Section 25-32-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Repeal Of Sections 25-32-1 Through 25-32-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Upon Implementation Of The Now-defunct Statewide Public Defender System; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public defenders; clarify authority over employees of the office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2011-02-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-09 | Passed | |
2011-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |