MS SB2943 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation Of Special Funds In The State Treasury For The Support And Maintenance Of The Mississippi Egg Marketing Board, For Fiscal Year 2022.
Title
Appropriation; Egg Marketing Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] |
Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Benjamin Suber [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Pigott,Mangold |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Jackson (32nd),Simmons (13th) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-11 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |