MS SB2941 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-19-99 And 27-19-155, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Portion Of The Funds Received From Registration And Tag Fees Shall Be Deposited Into A Special Fund Created In The State Treasury To Be Designated As The "license Tag Acquisition Fund"; To Provide That Monies In The Special Fund May Be Used For The Purposes Of Paying The Costs Incurred For Purchasing License Tags Or Plates, Decals And Associated Freight Costs; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor vehicle license tags; deposit portion of registration and tag fees into a special fund for purchase of.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-04 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Passed | |
2010-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Ways and Means | |
2010-02-04 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Finance |