MS SB2939 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 928, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, As Amended By Chapter 934, Local And Private Laws Of 2007, As Amended By Chapter 919, Local And Private Laws Of 2012, To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Tunica County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The Tunica County Economic Development Foundation, Inc., Through Calendar Year 2018; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tunica County; contribution of funds to the Tunica County Economic Development Foundation, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |