MS SB2929 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Chapter 52, Title 83, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Framework Within Which Guaranteed Asset Protection Waivers Are Defined And May Be Offered Within The State Of Mississippi; To Provide Definitions; To Provide Requirements For Offering Gap Waivers; To Provide Requirements For Contractual Liability And Other Insurance Policies That Insure A Gap Waiver; To Provide Disclosure Requirements; To Provide For Cancellation; To Provide Certain Exemptions; To Provide Enforcement Of The Chapter; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Guaranteed asset protection waivers; allow sales of and regulate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2018-03-08 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-07 | House | Amended |
2018-03-06 | House | Read the Third Time |
2018-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: BB To IN |
2018-02-20 | House | DR - TSDPAA: IN To BB |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Insurance;Banking and Financial Services |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-24 | Senate | DR - TSDP: BF To IN |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions;Insurance |