MS SB2928 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The University Of Mississippi Medical Center For Fiscal Year 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; IHL - University of Mississippi Medical Center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Approved by Governor
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-29HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-28SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-28HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-28SenateRecommitted For Further Conf
2020-06-28HouseRecommitted For Further Conf
2020-06-27HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-27SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-22HouseConferees Named Read,Beckett,Huddleston
2020-06-18SenateConferees Named Hopson,Branning,Suber
2020-06-17SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-16HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-15HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-15HouseAmended
2020-06-15HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-02HouseReferred To Appropriations
2020-06-01SenateTransmitted To House
2020-05-28SenatePassed
2020-05-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-05-27SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback