MS SB2926 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning For Support Of The Eight Universities' Designated Institutes, Laboratories And Programs For Which They Are Responsible And The Executive Office Of The Board Of Trustees For Fiscal Year 2021; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; IHL - Subsidiary programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Benjamin Suber [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Beckett,Bounds |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Branning,DeBar |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-16 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-15 | House | Amended |
2020-06-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-02 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Passed |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |