MS SB2922 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 75-35-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Food Product That Contains Cultured Animal Tissue Produced From Animal Cell Cultures Outside Of The Organism From Which It Is Derived Shall Not Be Labeled As Meat Or A Meat Food Product; To Provide That A Plant-based Or Insect-based Food Product Shall Not Be Labeled As A Meat Or Meat Food Product; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labeling; prohibit mislabeling of food products derived from animal cultures, plants and insects as meat or meat food products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Approved by Governor
2019-03-06HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-06SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-04HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-02-28HousePassed
2019-02-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-20HouseReferred To Agriculture
2019-02-08SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-07SenatePassed
2019-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Agriculture

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback