MS SB2921 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 57-10-401 Through 57-10-445, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Issuance Of Bonds By The Mississippi Business Finance Corporation To Finance Economic Development Projects In Order To Induce The Location Or Expansion Of Certain Businesses Within This State; To Reenact Section 27-7-22.3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For A Credit Against State Income Taxes For Certain Companies For Debt Service Paid By Such Companies Under Financing Agreements Entered Into With The Mississippi Business Finance Corporation Under Section 57-10-409; To Amend Section 57-10-449, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend Until October 1, 2015, The Repeal Date On Sections 57-10-401 Through 57-10-445 And Section 27-7-22.3; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Business Finance Corporation; extend repealer on authority to issue bonds to finance economic development projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-05 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-21 | Conferees Named Watson,Ellis,Moss | |
2011-03-18 | Conferees Named Kirby,Clarke,Hewes | |
2011-03-15 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Ways and Means | |
2011-02-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-09 | Passed | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Finance |