MS SB2918 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require Persons Using Certain Types Of Elevated Hunting Stands To Use A Full Body Safety Harness; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hunting; require person using elevated hunting stands to use safety harness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 13 N: 30 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-05 | Failed | |
2010-02-05 | Amended | |
2010-02-05 | Reconsidered | |
2010-02-04 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |