MS SB2916 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-977, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Move The Qualifying Deadline For Judicial Offices From May To March; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Judicial offices; change qualifying deadline to March 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed |
2019-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Elections |