MS SB2912 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-5-138.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That An Offender Who Has Been Convicted Of Certain Drug Crimes And Is In Trusty Status May Be Awarded Additional Trusty Earned Time; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Trusties who are authorized to accumulate additional earned time; revise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House Failed (Y: 44 N: 75 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Died On Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-04 | Failed | |
2010-03-04 | Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Reconsidered | |
2010-02-26 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-02-25 | Passed | |
2010-02-22 | Read the Third Time | |
2010-02-18 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Corrections | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-26 | DR - TSDP: CR To DP | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Corrections;Drug Policy |