MS SB2907 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Failed on March 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-30 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Failed on March 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-30 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-25-501, 27-25-503, 27-25-505, 27-25-701, 27-25-703 And 27-25-705, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reduce The Severance Tax On Oil And Natural Gas Produced From Horizontally Drilled Wells Or Horizontally Drilled Recompletion Wells From Which Production Commences From And After July 1, 2013, For A Period Of 30 Months Beginning On The Date Of First Sale Of Production; To Provide That The Revenue From Such Reduced Tax Shall Be Apportioned To The County In Which The Oil Or Natural Gas Was Produced; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Severance tax; reduce for 30 months for oil and gas produced from and after 7/1/13 from horizontally drilled wells.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 75 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-30 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Burton,Butler (38th) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-19 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-03-18 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Eaton, Cockerham, Staples, Myers, Ellis) |
2013-03-18 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-18 | House | Amended |
2013-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred To Energy |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Finance |