MS SB2900 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Designate A Portion Of Mississippi Highway 16 In Neshoba County, Mississippi, As The "carson W. Bounds Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorial highway; designate portion of Highway 16 in Neshoba County for Carson W. Bounds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Approved by Governor
2019-03-19HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-13HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-12HousePassed
2019-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Transportation
2019-02-08SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-07SenatePassed
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Highways and Transportation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback