MS SB2899 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-9-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Alternative Delivery Systems And Group Health Insurance Policies, Plans Or Programs Regulated By The State Of Mississippi Shall Not Deny Any Community Mental Health Center The Right To Participate As A Contract Provider If The Community Mental Health Center Agrees To Provide The Mental Health Services That Meet The Terms Of Requirements Set Forth By The Insurer Under The Policy Or Plan And Agrees To The Terms Of Reimbursement Set Forth By The Insurer; To Provide That Certification/licensure Of All Mental Health Providers By The Board Of Mental Health Shall Be Recognized By The Insurer And Shall Not Be Used As A Reason To Deny Any Mental Health Provider The Right To Participate As A Contract Provider; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Community mental health centers; provide that health insurers may not deny the right to participate as a contract provider.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Mims,McGee,Currie |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Bryan,Parker,Johnson |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |