MS SB2898 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 21-27-77, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Automatic Repealer On The Section Allowing Certain Municipalities To Adopt Rules And Procedures For Accounting System Accommodation Of Certain Uncollectible Indebtedness Owed By A Customer For Water And Sewer Services; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certain municipalities allowed to establish overdue water/sewer payment programs; extend program repeal date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-21 Approved by Governor
2022-03-30HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2022-03-30SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2022-03-27SenateConference Report Adopted
2022-03-26HouseConference Report Adopted
2022-03-25HouseConference Report Filed
2022-03-25SenateConference Report Filed
2022-03-25HouseConferees Named Rushing,Stamps,Crudup
2022-03-23SenateConferees Named Simmons (12th),McCaughn,Norwood
2022-03-23SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2022-03-10HouseReturned For Concurrence
2022-03-09HousePassed As Amended
2022-03-09HouseAmended
2022-03-08HouseRead the Third Time
2022-03-01HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2022-02-10HouseReferred To Municipalities
2022-02-10SenateTransmitted To House
2022-02-09SenatePassed
2022-02-09SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2022-02-01SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2022-01-28SenateDR - TSDPCS: MU To AC
2022-01-17SenateReferred To Municipalities;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212777Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2022/pdf/history/SB/SB2898.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2898IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2898CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2898PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2898SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2898_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2022/pdf/votes/senate/0370035.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2022/pdf/votes/house/0650026.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2022/pdf/votes/house/0820008.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2022/pdf/votes/senate/0830023.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback