MS SB2898 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Designate A Portion Of Mississippi Highway 25 In Aberdeen, Monroe County, Mississippi, As The "thomas Lee Bales Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Portion Of United States Highway 51 In Duck Hill, Montgomery County, Mississippi, As The "lucie E. Campbell Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Portion Of United States Highway 61 In Shaw, Bolivar County, Mississippi, As The "andrew And Mary Lou Hawkins Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Portion Of United States Highway 72 In Tishomingo County As The "mayor Johnny Biggs Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorial highways; designate various segments of highways as.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseReconsidered
2019-03-12HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Carpenter, Busby, Massengill)
2019-03-12HousePassed
2019-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Transportation
2019-02-08SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-07SenatePassed
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Highways and Transportation

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/SB/SB2898.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2898IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2898CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2898PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2898SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2898_H_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0310019.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0640026.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0650002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0710034.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback